Eight Simple Tricks to Learn Vedic Maths
Before diving into the 8 Vedic Maths Tricks, let me give you a brief idea of Vedic Mathematics. So that you do not need to check the internet further to know what Vedic Mathematics is. These 8 Vedic Mathematics tricks will be beneficial to reducing your calculation time for CBSE/State Board Examination, JEE Main, and other competitive exams.
What is Vedic Mathematics?
The word 'Vedic' came from Veda, which means knowledge. And Vedic Mathematics is a collection of sutras (formulae) to solve mathematical arithmetic problems easily and faster. It is a collection of 16 sutras and 13 sub-sutras which can be used to solve problems in arithmetic, geometry, calculus, algebra, and conics.
Why is it important to learn Vedic mathematics?
It helps a person solve mathematical problems more quickly. It helps you to make smart decision regarding simple and complex problems. It reduces the burden of remembering difficult concepts. It increases the child's concentration and willingness to learn and develop some new skills.
Using Vedic mathematical tricks, you can solve any difficult or slow JEE or ICSE/CBSE math problem. Also, simply using Vedic mathematicians to solve a mental problem is the beauty of Vedic mathematicians. Before learning polynomial functions and quadratic sums in a higher class at the CBSE or ICSE Tablet, Vedic mathematics knowledge will help you to master these difficulties at different levels.
Eight Vedic Mathematics Tricks
- Squiring of a number whose unit digit is five:
You belong from CBSE, ICSE, or any State board, and I can guarantee that you have faced questions like (55)^{2} = ?
With the help of Vedic mathematics, you can quickly solve this kind of problem whose unit digit is 5.
- Step 1: 55 ✕ 55 = _ _ 25
- Step 2: 5 ✕ (5 + 1) = 30
The answer is 3025.
Let’s look at one more example: 75
- Step 1: 75 ✕ 75 = _ _ 25
- Step 2: 7 ✕ (7 + 1) = 56
Answer = 5625.
If you understood this trick, try to find out the square between 85 and 95.
- Multiplication of a number by 5:
Generally, you will come across such calculations in board exams or any competitive exams to solve such math problems. This trick will help you a lot.
To apply this trick, take the number, depending on its nature (even or odd) divide it by 2(get half of the number)..
For Even number:
2464 ✕ 5 =?
- Step 1: Divide it by 2, 2464/2 = 1232
- Step 2: add 0.
The answer will be 2464 ✕ 5 = 12320
For Odd number:
3775 ✕ 5 =?
- Step 1: It is a odd number (3775 - 1)/2 = 1887
- Step 2: It's an odd number, so instead of using 0, we will put 5.
So the answer will be 3775 ✕ 5 = 18875.
- Subtraction from 1000, 10000, 100000:
How long does it take to subtract a number from a multiple of 100, such as 1000, 1000, 10000? 1 minute or less? Leave it alone and try calculating with this new formula and see if it's easy and reduces your calculation time or not!
Ex: 1000 - 573 = ?
In this trick, we simply subtract each figure in 573 from 9 and the last one from 10.
- 9 - 5 = 4
- 9 - 7 = 2
- 10 - 3 = 7
Answer: 1000 - 573 = 427
- Multiplication of any two digit number (11 - 19):
As long as you solve mathematics questions, you will face this problem every day. Whether you are preparing for your board examination or any competitive examination, this Vedic Mathematics trick will help you, especially for the multiplication of two numbers:
- Step 1: Add the unit digit of the smaller number to the more significant number.
- Step 2: Multiply the sum by 10.
- Step 3: Now multiply the unit digit of both two-digit numbers.
- Step 4: In the last, add both numbers.
Ex: Here, we have to find out the multiplication of two numbers, 15 and 13.
- Step 1:15 + 3 = 18
- Step 2:18 ✕ 10 = 180
- Step 3: 5 ✕ 3 = 15
- Step 4: 180 + 15 = 195
We tried our best to make you understand these Vedic mathematical tricks. It may seem a bit complicated at first, but your computing speed will be up to 80% once you get used to it. And this is what every student needs to be good at math!
- A large number divided by 5:
Please tell me how to divide a large number by 5. And how long does it take to solve such a sum? Here is your challenge:
3246 divided by 5. Before you start, start the timer:
So you find the answer in 2 sec? Or in 4 sec? The next time you see this kind of problem, try to solve it with the help of Vedic mathematics.
- Step 1: Multiply the given number by 2.
- Step 2: Move the decimal point to the left.
- Step 3: The left side of the decimal point is your answer.
Ex: 3246 / 5 = ?
Step 1: 3246 ✕ 2 = 6492
Step 2: 649.2
- Step 3: The answer is 649.
If you understand, try to find out the answer of 134, 7982, 4569.
- Multiplication of any two-digit number by 11:
Use this Vedic math trick to complete multiplications in just 2 seconds. Let's see how to reduce calculator time using this Vedic mathematics method.
For Ex: 32 ✕ 11 = ?
32 * 11 = 3(3 + 2)2 = 352
For Ex: 45 ✕ 11 = ?
45 * 11 = 4 (4 + 5) 5 = 495
If you understand this trick, try to find out the answer to 78 ✕ 11, 62 * 11, 59 * 11
- Multiplication of any three-digit numbers:
To Find the multiplication of three-digit numbers with the help of Vedic Mathematics, you should follow the following steps:
For Ex: 308 * 306
- Step 1: Subtract the unit digit from the actual number
308 - 8 = 300
306 - 6 = 300
- Step 2: Now select any (first or second) number and add the unit digit of the other number.
308 + 6 = 314
- Step 3: Now multiply the product we got in Step 2 and Step 1.
314 * 300 = 94200
- Step 4: Find the product of the unit digit of these two numbers: 8 * 6 = 48.
- Step 5: Add Step 3 and Step 4.
94200 + 48 = 94248
Now solve these sums: 234 * 456, 894 * 789, 785 * 254
8. The trick to finding the Square Value:
Finding the square value of a number using the Vedic Mathematics trick is easy
- Step 1: Choose a base closer to the original number. Ex for 99, the base will be 100.
- Step 2: Subtract the actual number from the base. Difference (99 - 100 = -1)
- Step 3: Add the result with the actual number. {99 + (-1)} = 98
- Step 4: Multiply the result with the base. 98 * 100 = 9800
- Step 5: Add the product of the square of the difference to the result of the step above. ( 9800 + (-1)*2 ) = 9801
Let's look at another example:
(94)2 = ?
- Step 1: For 94, the base will be 100.
- Step 2: 94 - 100 = -6
- Step 3: 94 + (-6) = 88
- Step 4: 88 * 100 = 8800
- Step 5: 8800 + (-6)2 = 8836
For your practice: (95)2, (88)2, (85)2, (69)2
Practice a lot. These tricks may seem a little complicated or tricky at first, but once you practice, these tricks will work just fine when you start counting. Please leave your comments and let us know if these tricks helped you!
Related Blogs
- State-Wise Famous Temples in India: Very Useful for Competitive Exams
- Defence Research and Development Organization
- Agneepath Scheme
- International Maths Olympiad
- List Of Neighbouring Countries Of India
- List of Months of The Year
- States of India, their Capitals Languages and Formation Detail
- Facts About Indian Constitution: What Every Citizen Should Know
- List of The Countries In Whole World
- Jallianwala Bagh Massacre