. Express each number as a product of its prime factors


(i) 140

(ii) 156

(iii) 3825

(iv) 5005

(v) 7429

Best Answer

Explanation:

Let use the prime factorization method to prime factorize the provided numbers, then multiply the prime numbers to get the product of the prime numbers.

(i) Prime factorization of 

140 = 2x2x5x7

       = 22x5x7

(ii) Prime factorization of 

156 = 2x2x3x13

       = 22x5x7

(iii) Prime factorization of 

3825 = 3x3x5x5x17

         = 32x52x17

(iv) Prime factorization of 

5005 = 5x7x11x13

(v) Prime factorization of 

7429 = 17x19x23

Final Answer:

(i) 140 = 22x5x7

(ii) 156 = 22x3x13

(iii) 3825 = 32x52x17

(iv) 5005 = 5x7x11x13

(v) 7429 = 17x19x23

Talk to Our counsellor